GA HB48 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ad valorem tax exemptions, so as to revise and change certain provisions regarding applications for, waiver of, denial of, renewal of, and granting of freeport exemptions; to provide for level 1 and level 2 freeport exemptions; to provide for applicability to business inventory; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; freeport exemptions; revise and change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Allison [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Allen Peake [R] |
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - House - House Vote #698 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #615 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Vote #86 - Passage (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #615 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Vote #86 - Passage (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-17 | Act 606 | |
2012-04-17 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Recommitted | |
2012-02-07 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-09 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-02 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-02 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-25 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-24 | House First Readers |