GA HB479 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-05-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-05-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 17 of the O.C.G.A., relating to criminal procedure, so as to revise certain arrest powers; to provide for arrests by a law enforcement officer outside of the jurisdiction of his or her employing law enforcement agency under certain circumstances; to revise the grounds for arrest by a private person; to repeal in its entirety Article 4 of Chapter 4, relating to arrest by private persons; to amend Article 5 of Chapter 2 of Title 35 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor carrier compliance division; to amend Chapter 38 of Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to operators of private detective businesses and private security businesses; to amend Article 4 of Chapter 7 of Title 51 of the O.C.G.A., relating to detention or arrest on suspicion of shoplifting or film piracy; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Criminal procedure; revise certain arrest powers; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Don Hogan [R] | Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] | Rep. Gloria Frazier [D] |
Rep. Buddy DeLoach [R] | Rep. William Boddie [D] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Am: House Vote #373 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #346 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 37th: Senate Vote #345 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #214 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #346 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 37th: Senate Vote #345 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #214 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Effective Date 2021-05-10 | |
2021-05-10 | Act 264 | |
2021-05-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-16 | House | House Hopper |