GA HB478 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 24 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to opinions and expert testimony, so as to change the rules of evidence regarding expert testimony in criminal cases; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Evidence; expert testimony in criminal cases; change rules
Sponsors
Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Rep. James Burchett [R] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] |
Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. Mitchell Scoggins [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #766 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - Passage: House Vote #472 (Y: 138 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - Passage: House Vote #472 (Y: 138 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 743 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-16 | House | House Hopper |