GA HB475 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 27 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to game and fish, so as to revise provisions relating to the hunting of feral hogs; to revise definitions; to allow for the taking of feral hogs without a hunting license; to remove additional restrictions on the hunting of feral hogs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Game and fish; hunting of feral hogs; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. Buddy Harden [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #413 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #253 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #253 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 228 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-24 | House | House Hopper |