GA HB475 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 26 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the "Georgia Registered Professional Nurse Practice Act," so as to revise certain provisions relating to requirements for registered professional nurses in nontraditional nursing education programs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Registered Professional Nurse Practice Act; nontraditional education programs; revise certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Benjie Harbin [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] |
Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #430 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 150 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #328 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #279 - Pass (Y: 157 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #328 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #279 - Pass (Y: 157 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Effective Date | |
2009-04-29 | Act 60 | |
2009-04-29 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-01 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-12 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-19 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-18 | House First Readers |