GA HB474 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 31 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to charter schools, so as to provide for enrollment priorities in charter schools for educationally disadvantaged students and military students; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Charter schools; enrollment priorities for educationally disadvantaged students and military students; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Rep. Valerie Clark [R] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] | Rep. Rahn Mayo [D] |
Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #222 (Y: 166 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-24 | House | House Hopper |