GA HB466 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of Hahira, approved August 19, 1912 (Ga. L. 1912, p. 951), as amended, particularly by a home rule amendment filed with the Office of the Secretary of State January 24, 2011, so as to provide that councilmembers shall reside in their respective districts for a period of at least 12 months immediately prior to election and shall continue to reside in such district during his or her period of service; to provide for the filling of vacancies; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hahira, City of; councilmembers reside in district; provide
Sponsors
Rep. James Shaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #118 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House Vote #114 - Local Calendar (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 24 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House Vote #114 - Local Calendar (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 24 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-11 | Act 134 | |
2011-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-08 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-08 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-08 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-07 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-04 | House First Readers |