GA HB465 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 60 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to counties and municipal corporations, so as to prohibit local governments from imposing civil penalties upon an alarm systems contractor for a false alarm that occurs through no fault of the alarm systems contractor; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government; imposing civil penalties upon an alarm systems contractor for a false alarm that occurs through no fault of alarm systems contractor; prohibit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #392 (Y: 100 N: 65 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #294 (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #242 (Y: 113 N: 52 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-31HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2021-03-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-25SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-17SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-16SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-03-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-03-08HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-08HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-03HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-18HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-17HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-16HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback