GA HB462 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a homestead exemption from Coweta County School District ad valorem taxes for educational purposes in the amount of $40,000.00 for residents of that school district who are 65 years of age but less than 71 years of age, $60,000.00 for residents of that school district who are 71 years of age but less than 75 years of age, and $80,000.00 for residents of that school district who are 75 years of age or older, approved January 17, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 3501), so as to raise the exemption amounts; to provide for related matters; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Coweta County; school district ad valorem tax; raise homestead exemption amounts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #188 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #143 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #143 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 292 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House Hopper |