GA HB460 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Swainsboro to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Swainsboro, City of; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #194 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #116 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #116 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-03 | Act 109 | |
2017-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House Hopper |