GA HB459 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-05-10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-05-10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 5 of Chapter 36 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to limitation on annexation of areas furnished services or included in comprehensive zoning plan by certain counties, so as to prohibit annexations of county operated airport property by governing authorities of certain municipal corporations absent approval by the governing authority of the county operating the airport; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; prohibit annexations of county operated airport property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #293 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #124 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #124 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Effective Date 2021-05-10 | |
2021-05-10 | Act 276 | |
2021-05-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-11 | House | House Hopper |