GA HB451 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to property tax exemptions, so as to provide for the optional determination by a taxpayer of the fair market value applicable to inventory for which a level 1 freeport exemption is sought for certain taxable years; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; property; fair market value applicable to inventory; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] |
Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #390 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #252 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Senate Vote #249 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Passage: House Vote #169 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #252 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Senate Vote #249 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Passage: House Vote #169 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-05-04 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 162 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-11 | House | House Hopper |