GA HB451 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 11 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the commercial code, so as to adopt the revised Article 7 of the Uniform Commercial Code; to provide for conforming amendments to other provisions of such title; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Commercial code; Uniform Commercial Code; conforming amendments; adopt
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. David Ralston [R] |
Sen. Preston Smith [R] | Sen. Ed Tarver [D] | Sen. Dan Weber [R] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] |
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #745 - Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #246 - Pass (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #246 - Pass (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-27 | Act 470 | |
2010-05-27 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-19 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-18 | House First Readers |