GA HB447 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sales and use taxes, so as to exempt jet fuel from the state sales and use tax for a period of time and to levy an excise tax on jet fuel during such period; to modify provisions for the use of proceeds of taxes on jet fuel; to define a term; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax; jet fuel; exempt for a period of time and levy an excise tax during such period

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #137 (Y: 140 N: 25 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenateSenate Recommitted
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-05HouseHouse Notice to Reconsider
2019-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-22HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback