GA HB446 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to crimes and offenses, so as to provide for the offense of drive-by shooting; to modify the offense of aggravated assault; to provide for enhanced criminal penalties in certain circumstances; to provide for definitions; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses; offense of drive-by shooting; provide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-29HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-03-29HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2023-03-02HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-02-21HouseHouse First Readers
2023-02-16HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback