GA HB444 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a homestead exemption from City of Hiram ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes in the amount of the full value of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that city who are 70 years of age or older; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hiram, City of; ad valorem tax; residents 70 years of age or older; provide homestead exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #248 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #116 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #116 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-02 | Act 103 | |
2017-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House Hopper |