GA HB442 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Clayton County, approved January 28, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, p. 2032), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 5, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 4654), so as to provide for the salaries of the judges of the state court; to provide for a county supplement; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Clayton County; State Court; provide for salaries of judges
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] | Rep. Rhonda Burnough [D] |
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Keisha Waites [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #603 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #116 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #116 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 315 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House Hopper |