GA HB442 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 315
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Clayton County, approved January 28, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, p. 2032), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 5, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 4654), so as to provide for the salaries of the judges of the state court; to provide for a county supplement; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clayton County; State Court; provide for salaries of judges

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #603 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #116 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Act 315
2018-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-14SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-02-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-21HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback