GA HB441 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 12 of Title 53 of the O.C.G.A., relating to trusts, so as to establish qualified self-settled spendthrift trusts; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions for spendthrift provisions of trusts which are not within qualified self-settled spendthrift trusts; to provide for claims by creditors for such trusts; to provide for the creation of such trusts; to provide for transfers to such trusts; to provide for vacancies of trustees; to provide for standards for such trusts to be considered nonrevocable; to provide for beneficiary rights to withdrawal; to provide for claims for relief; to amend Part 4 of Article 9 of Title 11 of the O.C.G.A., relating to rights of third parties to secured transactions, so as to exclude qualified self-settled spendthrift trusts from restrictions on assignment; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trusts; establish qualified self-settled spendthrift trusts; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #798 (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #735 (Y: 103 N: 56 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #598 (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #201 (Y: 125 N: 37 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Veto V3
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-21HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2018-03-12SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-12SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-06SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-21HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback