GA HB44 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to make and provide appropriations for the State Fiscal Year beginning July 1, 2017, and ending June 30, 2018; to make and provide such appropriations for the operation of the state government and its departments, boards, bureaus, commissions, institutions, and other agencies, for the university system, common schools, counties, municipalities, and political subdivisions, for all other governmental activities, projects, and undertakings authorized by law, and for all leases, contracts, agreements, and grants authorized by law; to provide for the control and administration of funds; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General appropriations; State Fiscal Year July 1, 2017 - June 30, 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - House - House Vote #294 (Y: 172 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #211 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #190 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Vote #69 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01 Effective Date
2017-05-01 Act 37
2017-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-22SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2017-03-22HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2017-03-16SenateSenate Transmitted House
2017-03-16SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 4th, 48th, 46th
2017-03-16HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2017-03-16HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 116th, 159th, 47th
2017-03-16HouseHouse Insisted
2017-03-16SenateSenate Transmitted House
2017-03-16SenateSenate Insisted
2017-03-16HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2017-03-16HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2017-03-15SenateSenate Transmitted House
2017-03-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-15SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-21SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-17HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-17HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-12HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback