GA HB439 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 and Article 7 of Chapter 8 of Title 42 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic and ignition interlock devices, respectively, so as to require the installation of ignition interlock devices in motor vehicles as a condition of probation for individuals convicted of a first offense of driving under the influence; to amend Chapter 12A of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ignition interlock device providers, so as to revise a definition; to require ignition interlock device service providers to provide free and reduced services upon receipt of an ignition interlock device reduced fee voucher issued by the Department of Driver Services; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; installation of ignition interlock devices as a condition of probation for individuals convicted of a first offense of driving under the influence; require
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Steven Sainz [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] |
Rep. Micah Gravley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-03-03 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-11 | House | House Hopper |