GA HB439 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Veto V2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Veto V2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding insurance, so as to establish qualified low-income community investment; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide that certain entities may earn credit against state premium tax liability; to provide for certification of qualified equity investments; to provide for recapture of credit claimed under certain circumstances; to provide for certain refundable fees; to provide for a retaliatory tax; to provide for decertification; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia New Markets Jobs Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. James Shaw [R] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] |
Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Patty Stinson [D] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #448 (Y: 133 N: 24 NV: 14 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #402 (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #247 (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #161 (Y: 151 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #402 (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #247 (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #161 (Y: 151 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Veto V2 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-14 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-20 | House | House Hopper |