GA HB438 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to off-road vehicles, so as to restrict the operation of off-road vehicles on roadways; to provide for definitions; to prohibit the operation of off-road vehicles on highways and public spaces in a manner which poses a direct threat of harm to persons and property; to provide for penalties; to provide for civil forfeiture of off-road vehicles deemed to be contraband; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; off-road vehicles; restrict operation on roadways
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Gardner [D] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Sheila Jones [D] | Rep. Beth Beskin [R] |
Rep. Keisha Waites [D] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House Hopper |