GA HB436 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the membership of the Sinclair Water Authority, approved April 13, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 3648), as amended, so as to change the determination of a quorum of the members of the board of said authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sinclair Water Authority; determination of a quorum of the members of the board; change
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/55319 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/182458 |