GA HB434 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 22 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to eminent domain, so as to provide for an exception to the requirement that condemnations not be converted to any use other than a public use for 20 years from the initial condemnation; to provide for definitions; to provide for procedure; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eminent domain; requirement that condemnations not be converted to any use other than public use for 20 years; provide exception

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #397 (Y: 145 N: 17 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #357 (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #283 (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #203 (Y: 158 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-09 Act 265
2017-05-09HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-30HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2017-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2017-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-06SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-21HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-17HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback