GA HB432 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to revenue and taxation, so as to modify the rate of tax imposed on the Georgia taxable net income of individuals; to add Georgia income tax paid by an individual to Georgia taxable net income to the extent such tax was deducted in determining federal taxable income; to provide for an earned income tax credit; to provide for rules and regulations; to amend an Act approved March 2, 2018 (Ga. L. 2018, p. 8), which lowered the personal and corporate income tax rates, so as to repeal certain conflicting provisions related to personal income tax rates; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; tax imposed on the Georgia taxable net income of individuals; modify rate
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/55309 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/182396 |