GA HB431 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for an additional $10,000.00 homestead exemption from certain City of Alpharetta ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes, approved April 23, 1999 (Ga. L. 1999, p. 4836), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 11, 2009 (Ga. L. 2009, p. 4001), so as to increase the exemption amount from $40,000.00 to $45,000.00; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alpharetta, City of; ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes; increase homestead exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #188 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #80 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30 Effective Date
2019-04-30 Act 115
2019-04-30HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-14SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-21HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback