GA HB43 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act making and providing appropriations for the State Fiscal Year beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2017, known as the "General Appropriations Act," Act No. 517, approved May 2, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, Volume One, Appendix, commencing at page 1 of 145), so as to make, provide, and change certain appropriations for the operation of the state government and its departments, boards, bureaus, commissions, institutions, and other agencies, for the university system, common schools, counties, municipalities, and political subdivisions, for all other governmental activities, projects, and undertakings authorized by law, and for all leases, contracts, agreements, and grants authorized by law; to provide for the control and administration of funds; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental appropriations; State Fiscal Year July 1, 2016 - June 30, 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-14 - House - House Vote #50 (Y: 171 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #52 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #32 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Vote #12 (Y: 173 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15 Effective Date
2017-02-15 Act 5
2017-02-15HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-02-15HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-02-14SenateSenate Transmitted House
2017-02-14SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-02-14HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2017-02-14HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2017-02-09SenateSenate Transmitted House
2017-02-09SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-09SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-08SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-30SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-01-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-01-25HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-12HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback