GA HB426 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 10 of Title 17 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to procedure for sentencing and imposition of punishment, so as to revise the criteria for imposition of punishment for crimes involving bias or prejudice; to revise the sanctions for such crimes; to provide for the manner of serving such sentences; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; imposition of punishment for crimes involving bias or prejudice; revise criteria

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #697 (Y: 29 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #705 (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Vote #702 (Y: 127 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #213 (Y: 47 N: 115 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #214 (Y: 96 N: 64 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Effective Date
2020-06-26 Act 329
2020-06-26HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-25HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-23HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2020-06-23SenateSenate Transmitted House
2020-06-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-23SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-23SenateSenate Engrossed
2020-06-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-19SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-05HouseHouse Postponed
2019-03-04HouseHouse Postponed
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-21HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20192020/HB/426
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/182316.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/182814.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/184241.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/194219.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/194428.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/194575.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16803
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16802
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17853
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17863
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17855

Bill Comments

feedback