GA HB425 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 42-1-19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to petition for release from registration requirements, so as to revise certain risk assessment classifications regarding the state sexual offender registry; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Penal institutions; state sexual offender registry; revise certain risk assessment classifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-02-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-02-16HouseHouse First Readers
2023-02-15HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback