GA HB421 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 47-2-221 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to disability allowances payable to personnel for certain disabilities arising in the line of duty, so as to provide that community supervision officers employed by the Department of Community Supervision shall be entitled to certain disability benefits; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Retirement and pensions; officers employed by Department of Community Supervision shall be entitled to certain disability benefits; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Terry Rogers [R] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #593 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Vote #485 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Vote #485 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 400 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-01-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-19 | House | House Hopper |