GA HB42 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elections and primaries generally, so as to authorize election superintendents to correct mistakes and omissions on ballots for a primary or election; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections; election superintendents to correct mistakes and omissions on ballots for a primary or election; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Johnnie Caldwell [R] | Rep. Regina Quick [R] |
Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #76 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Vote #46 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Vote #46 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Effective Date | |
2017-02-23 | Act 7 | |
2017-02-23 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-02-23 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-12 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-11 | House | House Hopper |