GA HB416 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 27 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to wildlife generally, so as to make certain findings and declarations; to define certain terms; to regulate the use of certain drugs on wildlife; to establish a permit application for administering fertility control drugs to wildlife; to require a permit for administering fertility control drugs to wildlife; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for penalties; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Wildlife; use of certain drugs on wildlife; regulate
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. John Cox [R] | Rep. Sean Jerguson [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Rep. Mark Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-18 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-17 | House First Readers |