GA HB415 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to provide for the designation of a nonprofit organization to govern high school athletics in this state; to provide for definitions; to provide for a governing structure; to provide requirements for a board of directors; to provide for a representative assembly; to provide for a public liaison advisory committee; to provide for due process and appeals; to provide for amendments to the bylaws; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; designation of nonprofit organization to govern high school athletics; provide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-21HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-17HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback