GA HB414 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Effective Date 2023-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 37 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to governing and regulation of mental health, so as to provide for a grant program within the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Disabilities to provide behavioral health services to military service members, veterans, and their families; to provide for definitions; to provide for program qualification requirements; to provide for the adoption of rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health; grant program to aid service members, veterans, and their families; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-29 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #363 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #247 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Adoption Of The Amendment By The Sen From The 53rd As Amended: Senate Vote #246 (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #104 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-25 Effective Date 2023-04-25
2023-04-25 Act 26
2023-04-25HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2023-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2023-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2023-03-20SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2023-03-20SenateSenate Third Read
2023-03-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2023-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2023-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-02-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-02-16HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2023-02-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64374
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/214595
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/215761
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/216377
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/217833
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/218688
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/220434
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/218434
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/218436
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/218711
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/218437
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64374#21100
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64374#21411
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64374#21412
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64374#21603

Bill Comments

feedback