GA HB413 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 44 and 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to property and public utilities and public transportation, respectively, so as to provide for regulation of certain matters pertaining to rural telephone cooperatives; to provide for the donation of abandoned dividends or capital credits by rural telephone cooperatives for certain purposes; to provide for definitions; to provide for venue in proceedings against rural telephone cooperatives; to change certain provisions relating to the bylaws of rural telephone cooperatives; to provide for return of revenues upon the death of a member of a rural telephone cooperative; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utilities; regulation of certain matters pertaining to rural telephone cooperatives; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #394 (Y: 141 N: 21 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #356 (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #281 (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #181 (Y: 167 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09 Effective Date
2017-05-09 Act 263
2017-05-09HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-30HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2017-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-24SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-17HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-16HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/413
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/165729.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/168953.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169338.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169958.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170008.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170175.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170688.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15009
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15351
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15487
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15395

Bill Comments

feedback