GA HB412 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to professions and businesses, so as to provide for the licensure of individuals in the practice of applied behavior analysis; to provide legislative findings; to provide for definitions; to create the Georgia Behavior Analyst Licensing Board; to provide for its membership and duties; to provide for licensing requirements; to provide for penalties; to provide for statutory construction; to provide for temporary licenses; to provide for reciprocity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and businesses; licensure of individuals in the practice of applied behavior analysis; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Karen Bennett [D] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #879 (Y: 163 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #768 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Passage: House Vote #503 (Y: 158 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #768 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Passage: House Vote #503 (Y: 158 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 811 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-11 | House | House Hopper |