GA HB41 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-4-11 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to qualifications of applicants for examination or certificate of registration as an architect, so as to change the qualifications so as to allow certain students to take such examination; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Architects; allow certain students to take examination; change qualifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #179 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #79 (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-01 Act 41
2017-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-13SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-13SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-10SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-22HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-22HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-12HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback