GA HB405 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 38 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the emergency powers of the Governor, so as to require the Georgia Emergency Management and Homeland Security Agency to establish a state-wide system to facilitate the transport and distribution of essentials in commerce during a state of emergency declared by the Governor; to provide for a definition; to provide for the certification of organizations and business entities that would be engaged in such transportation and such distribution; to provide for privileges for employees and agents of such organizations and business entities; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Emergency Management and Homeland Security Agency; establish state-wide system to facilitate the transport and distribution of essentials in commerce during a state of emergency; require
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #367 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #119 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #119 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-09 | Act 261 | |
2017-05-09 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House Hopper |