GA HB401 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1A of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to early care and learning; to amend Code Section 16-12-1.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to restrictions on persons with criminal records with regard to child, family, or group-care facilities, so as to revise terminology; to amend Code Section 25-2-13 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of fire and other hazards in buildings presenting special hazards to persons or property, so as to revise terminology; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Early care and learning; revise terminology relating to restrictions on persons with criminal records with regard to child, family or group-care facilities; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Bruce Broadrick [R] |
Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #329 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #254 (Y: 170 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #254 (Y: 170 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 163 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-08 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-19 | House | House Hopper |