GA HB398 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 311
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 17 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions for the Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund, so as to update a cross-reference; to add a position eligible for membership in such fund; to provide for a certain employer's contribution to such fund; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund; update a cross-reference; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #639 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Vote #463 (Y: 167 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Act 311
2018-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-21SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-21SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-09SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-06HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-06HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-01-25HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-17HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-16HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback