GA HB398 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate and grant a new charter to the City of Monticello, approved March 10, 1959 (Ga. L. 1959, p. 2683), as amended, so as to dissolve the municipal court; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Monticello, City of; dissolve municipal court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #70 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Vote #75 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Vote #75 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 161 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-19 | House | House Hopper |