GA HB398 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 10-1-393 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to unfair or deceptive practices in consumer transactions unlawful, so as to authorize licensed personal care homes and community living arrangements to use certain terms; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Consumer transactions; licensed personal care homes and community living arrangements to use certain terms; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. Mickey Channell [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Valerie Clark [R] |
Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2013-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-19 | House | House Hopper |