GA HB398 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing in Fulton County a system for pension and retirement pay to teachers and employees of the Board of Education of Fulton County, approved February 2, 1945 (Ga. L. 1945, p. 528), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 19, 2009 (Ga. L. 2009, p. 4004), so as to correct certain typographical errors; to amend certain provisions so as to comply with the federal Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act of 1994 and the federal Heroes Earnings Assistance and Relief Tax Act of 2008; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fulton County; Board of Education pensions and retirement; correct typographical errors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #725 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Vote #722 - Local Calendar Without Hb 1113 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 19 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Vote #722 - Local Calendar Without Hb 1113 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 19 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 489 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-21 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-21 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-19 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2012-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-04 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-02 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-01 | House First Readers |