GA HB396 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to repeal an Act creating the South Georgia Regional Information Technology Authority, approved May 29, 2007 (Ga. L. 2007, p. 4336), as amended; to provide for assets and liabilities thereof; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
South Georgia Regional Information Technology Authority; repeal Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #213 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #73 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 26 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #73 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 26 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-05-03 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 44 | |
2021-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-10 | House | House Hopper |