GA HB395 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 10A of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to professional counselors, social workers, and marriage and family therapists, so as to revise certain licensing provisions; to enter into an interstate compact known as the "Professional Counselors Licensure Compact"; to authorize the Georgia Composite Board of Professional Counselors, Social Workers, and Marriage and Family Therapists to administer the compact in this state; to authorize the board to conduct national background checks; to provide for conditions; to provide for eligibility; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
The Professional Counselors Licensure Compact Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #254 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #119 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #119 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 34) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-10 | Act 287 | |
2021-05-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-18 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-10 | House | House Hopper |