GA HB395 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to establish qualified low-income community investment; to provide a short title; to provide definitions; to provide that certain entities may earn credit against state premium tax liability; to provide for certification of qualified equity investments; to provide for recapture of credit claimed under certain circumstances; to provide for certain refundable fees; to provide for a retaliatory tax; to provide for decertification; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia New Markets Jobs Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. James Shaw [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-19 | House | House Hopper |