GA HB395 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions concerning state sales and use taxes, so as to extend the sales and use tax exemption for certain tangible personal property used in direct connection with the construction of certain symphony halls; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; personal property; construction of certain symphony halls; extend exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #375 - Passage (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #286 - Pass (Y: 158 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #286 - Pass (Y: 158 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-04 | Act 127 | |
2009-05-04 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-23 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-04 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-12 | House First Readers |