GA HB394 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 23 of Chapter 2 of Title 20, Chapter 1 of Title 35, and Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to traffic safety, general provisions for law enforcement officers and agencies, and general provisions regarding the uniform rules of the road, respectively, so as to authorize certain personnel employed by or volunteering for law enforcement agencies or fire departments to assist in directing and regulating the flow of traffic and to clarify provisions relating thereto; to provide for training requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Uniform rules of the road; certain personnel employed by or volunteering for law enforcement agencies or fire departments to assist in directing and regulating the flow of traffic; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Ginny Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] |
Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Matt Barton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House Hopper |