GA HB390 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for the assessment of no points and a maximum fine for the offense of failure to obey a traffic control device in certain instances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; assessment of no points and maximum fine for failure to obey traffic control device in certain instances; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #243 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-15 | House | House Hopper |